CA SB289 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.993 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: home- and community-based services: military.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB289 Archuleta et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 289 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB289 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 289 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB289 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3264.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1095.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 576.) (April 3). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | March 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.993 | New Code | See Bill Text |