CA SB286 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 30001.3, 30601.4, 30616, and 30617 to, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 7100) to Part 2 of Division 6 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offshore wind energy projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB286 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 286 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB286 McGuire et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 386, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2832.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2023-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2023-09-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 69 suspended.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-08-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2023-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2023-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2023-06-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2023-06-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1163.) (May 18).
2023-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2023-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 870.) (April 24).
2023-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2023-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 657.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2023-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C.
2023-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-15SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-03SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code30001.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code30601.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code30616New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code30617New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#91AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#90ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286#89CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB286

Bill Comments

feedback