CA SB286 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1007.5 to the Education Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: Orange County Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB286 Min (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB286 Min (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and ED. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2820.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2794.) (January 20). |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2761.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2753.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Set for hearing January 12. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | March 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1007.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |