CA SB285 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26200 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: retail preparation, sale, and consumption of noncannabis food and beverage products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB285 Allen (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O.
2023-05-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 3.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 746.) (April 17).
2023-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2023-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2023-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2023-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26200Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback