CA SB285 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-13)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 13999) to Part 4.7 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Tourism Recovery Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01SenateDied on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2021-05-28SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-03-22SenateMarch 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 8.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
2021-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13999New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback