CA SB282 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.9 (commencing with Section 50492) to Part 2 of Division 3 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 2985.6 to, and to repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 2985) of Chapter 7 of Title 1 of Part 3 of, the Penal Code, relating to supportive housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supportive housing for parolees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB282 Beall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and H. & C.D.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1199.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1095.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 802.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 551.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-02-28SenateMarch 26 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-02-26SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING and PUB. S.
2019-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code50492New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code2985Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2985.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback