CA SB28 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 673, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5895 to, and to repeal Section 5960 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital Infrastructure and Video Competition Act of 2006: deployment data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB28 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 28 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Salas (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB28 Caballero et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 673, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1).
2021-06-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2021-05-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-06SenateMay 10 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 20).
2021-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-04-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 755.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 12.
2021-02-17SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and G.O.
2021-02-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code5895New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5960Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback