CA SB276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 120370, 120375, and 120440 of, and to add Sections 120372 and 120372.05 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunizations: medical exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB276 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 276 Pan Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB276 Pan et al (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2019-09-04SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2472.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 2970.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 15. Page 2970.)
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 30).
2019-07-10AssemblyJuly 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20).
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 1208.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1094.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 848.) (April 24).
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code120370Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code120372New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120372.05New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120375Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code120440Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback