CA SB275 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 11759) of Part 1 of Division 10.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Alcohol and drug treatment: youth.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB275 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 275 Portantino Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB275 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 275 Portantino Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB275 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 6069.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6760.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1223.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 515.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54238.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11759 | New Code | See Bill Text |