CA SB274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19311 of, and to add Section 18622.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Administration of taxes: notice of deficiency assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB274 Glazer et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 274 Glazer Third Reading Urgency By BURKE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB274 Glazer et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 274 Glazer Third Reading Urgency By BURKE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB274 Glazer et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6113.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 6069.) |
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5880.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6587.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | July 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 802.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Published April 18 at 9 p.m. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 585.) (April 3). |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 362.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19614 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18622.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |