CA SB271 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 197 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to add Section 19548.6 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to juries.
Title
Juries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | January 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2755.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 2727.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 12 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Set for hearing January 6. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 521.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and GOV. & F. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 197 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19548.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |