CA SB27 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.3 (commencing with Section 39740) to Part 2 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carbon sequestration: state goals: natural and working lands: registry of projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB27 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 27 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB27 Skinner et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2386.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-02SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2712.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2021-06-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 938.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-03-25SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 499.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2021-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39740New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#91ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27#90CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB27

Bill Comments

feedback