CA SB27 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 14400) to Division 7 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to livestock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock: use of antimicrobial drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 5)SB2 7 Hil l (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 27 Hill Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 71 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB27 Hill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2015-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2775.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 6. Page 3185.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-09-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-09-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 9).
2015-09-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2015-09-04AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-08-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 17)
2015-07-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1).
2015-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2015-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2015-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1146.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-04SenateMay 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 4.
2015-04-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 698.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2015-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2014-12-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4846.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code14400New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code14404Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_27&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150601_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150625_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150708_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150714_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150817_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150831_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150904_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150910_amended_asm_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20150916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20151010_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150421_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150504_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150602_0505PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150701_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150909_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150911_0804PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20150911_0919PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback