CA SB266 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 760, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 760, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5015.8 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.
Title
State park system: Chino Hills State Park: expansion.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 266 Newman Senate Third Reading By Chen (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB266 Newman et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB266 Newman et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 760, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2600.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1231.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1185.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 519.) (March 16). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5015.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |