CA SB265 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17131.8 and 24308.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: federal conformity: grant allocations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-03-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17131.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24308.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback