CA SB265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on September 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 49557.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil meals, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil meals: Child Hunger Prevention and Fair Treatment Act of 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB265 Hertzberg et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 265 Hertzberg Third Reading Urgency By McCarty (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB265 Hertzberg et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1094.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3).
2019-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-11SenateMarch 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49557.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback