CA SB264 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 684, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 684, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 27575 to the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: the OC Fair and Event Center.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB264 Min et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 264 Min Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB264 Min et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 264 Min Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB264 Min et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 684, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2387.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 2713.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1309.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | April 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 521.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 27575 | New Code | See Bill Text |