CA SB263 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 10151, 10153.2, and 10170.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate.
Title
Real estate applicants and licensees: education requirements: fair housing and implicit bias training.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB263 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 263 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB263 Rubio et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 263 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB263 Rubio et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 361, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2554.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2913.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 912.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 405.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 10153.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 10170.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |