CA SB262 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Read third time. Refused passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Read third time. Refused passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1269d and 1302.5 to the Penal Code, relating to bail.
Title
Bail.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 262 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 32 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB262 Hertzberg et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB262 Hertzberg et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Bauer-Kahan. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1258.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 592.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1269 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1302.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |