CA SB262 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 9:30 am in Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8051 and 8405.4 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to commercial fishing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial fishing: landing fees: sea cucumbers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code8051Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code8405.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback