CA SB262 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jun 11 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 71350, 71354, 71356, 71358, and 71360 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate change: climate adaptation: advisory council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB262 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 768.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 537.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback