CA SB260 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 100503.4 to the Government Code, to amend Section 1366.50 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10786 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic health care coverage enrollment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB260 Hurtado Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 260 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB260 Hurtado (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2842.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3263.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1094.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 576.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-18SenateMarch 20 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-05SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100503.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1366.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10786Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback