CA SB26 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67456 of the Education Code, relating to collegiate athletics, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Collegiate athletics: student athlete compensation and representation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB26 Skinner et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 26 Skinner Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 26 Skinner Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-08-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2113.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2439.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1348.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 666.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |