CA SB259 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13012.7 to the Penal Code, relating to crime statistics.
Title
Department of Justice: crime statistics reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent SB259 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - SB 259 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB259 Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Assembly - SB 259 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB259 Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1094.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13012.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |