CA SB258 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 50491 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to homeless shelters.
Title
California Emergency Solutions and Housing Program: grants: homeless shelters: pets and veterinary services.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB258 Hertzberg et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB258 Hertzberg et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1094.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 437.) (March 25). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50491 | New Code | See Bill Text |