CA SB255 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1357.503 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10753.05 of the Insurance Code, relating to health insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance: employer associations: large group health insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR.
2021-01-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1357.503Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10753.05Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback