CA SB254 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 37222.21 to the Education Code, relating to public schools.
Title
Public schools: September 11th Remembrance Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - SB 254 Borgeas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB254 Borgeas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB254 Borgeas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2206.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 611.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 668.) (March 17). |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 37222.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |