CA SB253 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1690 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the military.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military: service: elected officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1690Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback