CA SB252 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 48412 and 51421 of, and to add and repeal Section 51421.5 to, the Education Code, relating to pupils, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Pupils: diploma alternatives: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB252 Leno Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 252 Leno Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB252 Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 252 Leno Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB252 Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2442.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2796.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)) |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1297.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 418.) (March 25). |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51421.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |