CA SB250 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Hearing: Jun 28 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1363.5 of, to add Section 1367.032 to, and to add Article 4.7 (commencing with Section 1366.70) to Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10123.135 of, to add Section 10123.134 to, and to add Article 1.3 (commencing with Section 10127.40) to Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB250 Pan et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1310.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1185.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-04-20SenateApril 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 532.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 17.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-10SenateMarch 10 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateSet for hearing March 10.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1363.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1367.032New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10123.134New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10123.135Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback