CA SB25 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 3160.3 and 3160.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: well stimulation treatments: earthquake and leak monitoring and reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2021-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3160.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3160.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |