CA SB249 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 200, 210.2, 220, and 234.1 of the Education Code, relating to educational equity.
Title
Educational equity: political affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-21-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 9. Page 859.) Reconsideration granted. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 210.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 234.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |