CA SB245 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 30505, 30524.5, 31751.4, and 31764.5 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to public animal shelters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public animal shelters: adoptions: veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB245 Chang et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-07-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 997.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and V.A.
2019-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code30505New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code30524.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code31751.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code31753Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code31764.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback