CA SB242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65352, 65940, and 65944 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 21098 of the Public Resources Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use applications: Department of Defense: points of contact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-05 - Assembly - SB 242 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB242 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB242 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2548.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 823.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 550.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | March 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65944 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21098 | Amended Code | Citation Text |