CA SB242 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 1285.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 1285.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 2.7 (commencing with Section 60) to Division 1 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Social networking Internet Web sites: privacy: minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Corbett (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Corbett (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Corbett Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Corbett (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Corbett Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 1285.) | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 16. Page 1142.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Corbett. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1142.) | |
2011-05-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 950.) (May 10). | |
2011-05-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-10 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |