CA SB24 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 740, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 740, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 99250) to Part 65 of Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to public health, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public health: public university student health centers: abortion by medication techniques.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB24 Leyva Letter to Journal (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 24 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Leyva et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 24 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Leyva et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 740, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2939.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3536.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 11). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1166.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 576.) (April 3). |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 99250 | New Code | See Bill Text |