CA SB24 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 87206 and 87207 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: economic interest disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB24 Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 764.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 428.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 87206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 87207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |