CA SB24 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 607, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 487h of the Penal Code, relating to theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grand theft: cargo.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB24 Oropeza (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 24 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By BERRYHILL, B (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB24 Oropeza (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Assembly - SB 24 Oropeza Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB24 Oropeza (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 607, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by Governor.
2009-09-28 Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-09-10 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 2378.) To enrollment.
2009-09-09 In Senate. To unfinished business.
2009-09-08 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3077.) To Senate.
2009-09-04 Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Read third time. Amended. (Page 3044.) To third reading.
2009-09-01 In Assembly. Held at Desk.
2009-08-31 Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Action rescinded whereby Assembly amendments were concurred in. Returned to Assembly for further action.
2009-08-24 Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-08-17 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1840.) To enrollment.
2009-07-15 To Special Consent Calendar.
2009-07-09 In Senate. To unfinished business.
2009-07-09 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2448.) To Senate.
2009-07-06 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-07-02 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
2009-06-16 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
2009-06-11 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-05-21 To Com. on PUB. S.
2009-05-11 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-05-11 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 828.) To Assembly.
2009-05-06 To Special Consent Calendar.
2009-05-05 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-04 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-04-24 Set for hearing May 4.
2009-04-21 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 587.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-01 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-03-25 Set for hearing April 21.
2009-03-24 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-03-17 Set for hearing March 31.
2009-01-29 To Com. on PUB. S.
2008-12-02 From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2008-12-01 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_24&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20081201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20090401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20090611_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20090904_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20090915_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090421_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090511_1254PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090616_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090701_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090709_1119AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090817_1250PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090908_0327PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_24_vote_20090910_0152PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback