CA SB238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 849, 851.6, and 1417.7 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Criminal procedure: arrests and evidence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar SB238 Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 238 Hertzberg Third Reading Urgency By BLOOM (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB238 Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 238 Hertzberg Third Reading Urgency By BLOOM (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB238 Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2905.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3149.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 768.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 430.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1417.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 851.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |