CA SB237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 365.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: direct transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB237 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 237 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB237 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 237 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB237 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 6146.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 6198.) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d) . (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6076.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 17. Page 6981.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 545.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 429.) (March 21). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 851.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 365.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |