CA SB237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 365.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: direct transactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB237 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 237 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB237 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 6146.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 6198.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d) . (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6076.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 17. Page 6981.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-09-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-09-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-07-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2017-06-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-03-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 545.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-03-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 429.) (March 21).
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code849Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code851.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code365.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code13365Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback