CA SB236 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 8334.6 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways.
Title
Public streets, highways, and public service easements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB236 Beall Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 236 Beall Senate Third Reading By CAMPOS (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB236 Beall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 236 Beall Senate Third Reading By CAMPOS (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB236 Beall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2274.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 2625.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 954.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (May 5). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 8330.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 8334.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |