CA SB235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65400, 65584.07, and 65913.4 of, and to add Sections 65584.08 and 65585.3 to, the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing production report: regional housing need allocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB235 Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 235 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB235 Dodd (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 235 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB235 Dodd (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2940.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3536.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 819.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 551.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65585.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65913.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |