CA SB235 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 512, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 512, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13107 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: ballot designation requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB235 Allen Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 235 Allen Senate Third Reading By CUNNINGHAM (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB235 Allen (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 235 Allen Senate Third Reading By CUNNINGHAM (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB235 Allen (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 512, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2993.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 3399.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 18). |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1133.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Published May 16 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1020.) (May 9). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 929.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30534 | Amended Code | Citation Text |