CA SB235 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 505, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22370, 22372, 22373, 22374, 22375, and 22377 of the Financial Code, relating to consumer loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small dollar loans: finder duties and compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent #9 SB235 Block (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 235 Block Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB235 Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 505, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-03SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2015-09-01SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2376.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2015-08-27SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2636.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2015-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2015-08-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14).
2015-07-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected July 16).
2015-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2015-06-22AssemblyJune 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
2015-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-05-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-18SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2015-05-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 818.) (April 28).
2015-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2015-04-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2015-02-26SenateReferred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
2015-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2015-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_235&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20150217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20150505_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20150708_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20150715_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20150817_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20150901_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_bill_20151005_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20150415_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20150428_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20150522_0954AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20150714_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20150819_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20150827_1105AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_235_vote_20150901_0354PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback