CA SB234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to fishing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fishing: local regulation: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB234 Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 585.) (April 3).
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-22SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 364.) (March 14).
2017-02-18SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2017-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code5504New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback