CA SB231 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 118.9 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to the Department of Transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation: transfer of property: Blues Beach property.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB231 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 231 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB231 McGuire et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 231 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB231 McGuire et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2526.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2817.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1413.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 942.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 118.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |