CA SB231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 536, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 53750 of, and to add Section 53751 to, the Government Code, relating to local government finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: fees and charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 231 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 41 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB231 Hertzberg (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 536, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-06 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 29. Page 2856.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 14).
2017-05-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-04-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 872.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-20SenatePublished April 19 at 9 p.m.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-19SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-04-19SenateRead third time and amended.
2017-04-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 5).
2017-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-02-03SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53750Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53751New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback