CA SB229 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 54230.7 to the Government Code, relating to surplus land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus land: disposal of property: violations: public meeting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB229 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 229 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB229 Umberg (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-18 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2670.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3144.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2023-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2023-08-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 23).
2023-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2023-06-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2023-06-27AssemblyJune 28 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-05-26AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2023-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1206.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2023-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2023-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 795.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2023-02-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2023-02-01SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2023-01-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
2023-01-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54230.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback