CA SB229 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 49595) to Chapter 9 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil health: mental health services: grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2021-04-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49595New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback